judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TROUGHTON (BARRY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34912
Short Caption:TROUGHTON (BARRY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35031 , 37315
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 25677Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/01/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09476
10/21/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. " . . . we order this appeal dismissed without prejudice to appellant's right to file and perfect a timely appeal following the district court's pronouncement of the sentence." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-10299
11/16/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-11250
11/16/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/22/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 17, 1999. 99-11250