judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RANDAL JOE CRAFT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0039)
Case Number:S-11-0039Case Docketed On:02/09/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:RANDAL JOE CRAFT v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RANDAL JOE CRAFT, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRandal Joe CraftDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Gregory A. Phillips
Jeremiah Isaac Williamson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel
Opinion Number:2011 WY 142
Citation:262 P.3d 1253

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/09/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/24/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/05/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/06/2011Event - Phone Call from AG's office. They forgot to attach order to brief of appellee. It is already attached to brief of appellant and advised them they didn't need to resubmit or attach to hard copies this time.EventPhone CallFinal
05/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
05/10/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/10/2011Event - Other - E-filing service system error - service notification not sent by e-mail until 5/10/2011. Adjusted tickler date to reflect actual date of service by system.EventOtherFinal
05/12/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina N. Olson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jeremiah I. Williamson for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/07/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/14/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/14/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Olson for appellant; D. Michael Pauling and Jeremiah Isaac Williamson, argument by Mr. Williamson for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/14/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/01/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/01/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/04/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/03/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal