judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOUDERMILK VS. LOUDERMILK

Case Information: 34913
Short Caption:LOUDERMILK VS. LOUDERMILKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D225742Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:ShearingCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/08/1999 / Combs, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Shearing. Law firm of Gordon & Silver, Ltd.
10/04/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Beckley Singleton Jemison Cobeaga & List--check no. 72051.
10/04/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09477
10/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/29/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-11870
12/20/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-12878
01/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. SNP/CLK 00-00477
01/12/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.