judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6449
A-6449
07/08/1957
Application for Writ of Error
JAMES DITTO, JR., INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF JAMES DITTO, SR.
DITTO INVESTMENT COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/04/1957Response to Brief filedRespondent
11/26/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/11/1957Response to Reply filedRespondent
07/25/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/16/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
07/08/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/22/1958Dissenting opinion issued.
01/22/1958Concurring Opinion issued.
01/22/1958Opinion issued
12/04/1957Response to Brief filed
11/29/1957Miscellaneous letter
11/26/1957Reply to Response
11/13/1957Letter Filed
11/11/1957Response to Reply filed
11/06/1957Letter Filed
10/02/1957Document received (See Remarks)
07/25/1957Reply to Response
07/16/1957Response to Petition
07/08/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/08/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ditto Investment CompanyRespondent
James Ditto, Jr., Independent Executor of the Estate of James Ditto, Sr.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information