judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PETER B. STEIGER and SYLVIA STEIGER v. HAPPY VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Case Heading (S-09-0081)
Case Number:S-09-0081Case Docketed On:04/22/2009
Linked To: S-07-0260
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Corporations, Partnerships and Associations (Title 17)
Short Title:PETER B. STEIGER and SYLVIA STEIGER v. HAPPY VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Full Title:PETER B. STEIGER and SYLVIA STEIGER, Appellants (Defendants), v. HAPPY VALLEY HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPeter B. Steiger Pro Se
AppellantSylvia Steiger Pro Se
AppelleeHappy Valley Homeowners AssociationWilliam D. Bagley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure, Civil Procedure, Property -Servitudes
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/22/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/22/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/22/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter. Brief schedule in S-07-0260 resumed by notice in this letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/18/2009Motion - Extension of time - brief of AppellantsMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/19/2009Order - Grant - extension of time (Sixty day extension requested, forty-five day extension granted)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/02/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/06/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/10/2009Motion - Brief - exceed page limit (and third extension of time)MotionBrief - exceed page limitFinal
08/12/2009Order - Grant - third extension of time. Order granting appellants' request for extension to file brief and order denying appellants' motion for permission for additional pages in brief (no further extensions will be considered).OrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
08/12/2009Response/Objection - Motion. Objection to appellants' motion for permission for additional pages in brief. (No action taken, court has already entered order denying request for additional pages earlier today.)Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
08/20/2009Brief - AppellantsBriefAppellantFinal
08/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
08/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Objection to Appellants' Motion for Permission for Additional Pages in Brief (Untimely--received 9 days late)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/04/2009Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docket by AppellantsNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
10/05/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/07/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/19/2009Brief - Appellants reply briefBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/19/2009Motion - Stay - other - Appellants' motion to stay judgment on appeal; and received proposed order.MotionStay - otherFinal
10/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/26/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/05/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits; Volume V, Original Supreme Court Record 05-110.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/10/2009Order - Denying Motion for StayOrderDenyFinal
12/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/02/2010Notice-Incoming - Change of address from AppellantsNotice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
06/29/2010Record - Supplemental record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, transcripts (labeled as Volume VI).RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
06/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Supplemental record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingSupplemental record on appeal filedFinal
12/07/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the court. Justice Voigt files a specially concurring opinion. Justice Hill files a dissenting opinion, in which Justice Golden joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/23/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/23/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/28/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/27/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal