judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6160
A-6160
01/04/1957
Application for Writ of Error
H. B. ZACHRY, TRUSTEE
CITY OF SAN ANTONIO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/20/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/24/1957Post submission brief filedRespondent
04/24/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/03/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
01/04/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/10/1961Letter Filed
10/25/1957Motion for leave to file briefDenied
06/20/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/08/1957Response to Motion filed
06/05/1957Dissenting opinion issued.
06/05/1957Concurring Opinion issued.
06/05/1957Opinion issued
05/24/1957Post submission brief filed
04/24/1957Reply to Response
04/03/1957Response to Petition
03/14/1957Letter Filed
01/30/1957Document received (See Remarks)
01/04/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/04/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H. B. Zachry, TrusteePetitioner
City of San Antonio by and through City Public Service Board of San AntonioRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information