judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00187-CV
03-94-00187-CV
04/13/1994
Dismissal for want of prosecution
Wayne Dugan d/b/a D & M Paint Company
Llano County Independent School District, Benchmark Commercial Builders Company, and Security National Insurance Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/30/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/22/1996CASE STORED
06/23/1995Mandate Issued
04/19/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/27/1995Motion for rehearing filed
03/15/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/22/1995Submitted
02/22/1995Submission
02/14/1995list of additional authorities
01/30/1995Oral argument acknowledged
01/24/1995Oral argument acknowledged
01/19/1995Oral argument acknowledged
01/17/1995Submission
08/18/1994Brief filed
08/16/1994Brief filed
08/16/1994Case ready to be set
07/28/1994Brief filed
07/08/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/24/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/26/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/13/1994Transcript Filed
04/13/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/23/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Llano County Independent SchooAppelleeMs. Dorcas A. Green
Mr. Eric W. Schulze
Benchmark Commercial BuildersAppelleeMr. Forrest B. Mccray
Dugan, Wayne D/b/a D & M PaintAppellantMr. H. Thomas Hirsch
Security National Insurance CoAppelleeMr. Forrest B. Mccray
Trial Court Information
33rd District Court
Llano
Honorable Clayton E Evans
9541