judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00383-CR
14-94-00383-CR
04/14/1994
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Barentine, Andrew Ranton
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/27/1995Case stored
10/30/1995Mandate due to be issued
10/30/1995Mandate Issued
10/30/1995Mandate Issued
10/13/1995Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
06/20/1995Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
06/20/1995Extend time to file PDR FILED
05/04/1995Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/04/1995Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/12/1995Submitted
04/12/1995Submission
04/12/1995Submitted
03/20/1995Submission
12/05/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/05/1994Case ready to be set
12/05/1994Case ready to be set
12/02/1994State's brief DUE
11/10/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/04/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/02/1994State's brief DUE
10/05/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/22/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/15/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/08/1994Past due brief
09/07/1994Appellant's brief DUE
08/08/1994Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
08/04/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
07/26/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
07/25/1994No description available.
06/30/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
06/27/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
06/23/1994No description available.
05/05/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
04/28/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
04/14/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/22/1994Date of Sentence
02/22/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/24/2017Case StoredCase archived
10/30/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantStephen Christopher Taylor
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasB. Warren Goodson, Jr.
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
122nd District Court
Galveston
93CR0514
50 yrs. TDC