judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILKO (HILARY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34900
Short Caption:MILKO (HILARY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36508 , 36707 , 39977 , 40066 , 40957
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C152548Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/29/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-09300
10/12/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. June 7, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Tina B. Smith. 99-09856
10/19/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: October 29, 1999. 99-10148
10/29/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-10621
11/05/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed within 15 days of this order. 99-10859
11/15/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-11291
11/18/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Clark County Public Defender. 99-11450
12/03/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-12087
12/03/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 99-12088
05/25/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-08779
06/20/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-10372
06/20/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 29, 2000. 00-10372