judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JASON GERALD PHILLIP v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0080)
Case Number:S-09-0080Case Docketed On:04/22/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JASON GERALD PHILLIP v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JASON GERALD PHILLIP, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJason Gerald PhillipDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law -Self Defense, Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 14
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/22/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/22/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/09/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/20/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/04/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/19/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/24/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/25/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/12/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/02/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/02/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/02/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/04/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/3/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal