judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ACCESS TO JURY QUESTIONNAIRE; WASHINGTON POST, APLT

Case Information: 10-SP-1612
Short Caption:IN RE: ACCESS TO JURY QUESTIONNAIRE; WASHINGTON POST, APLTClassification:Appeals - Special Proceedings - Other Special Proceedings
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-9230-09Filed Date:12/23/2010

Opening Event Date:12/23/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/29/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/20/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/15/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus-AppellantAllbritton Communications CompanyN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantAlm Media LLCN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantAmerican Society of News EditorsN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantAssociated PressN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantAtlantic Media IncorporatedN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantDow Jones and Company IncorporatedN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantGannett Company IncorporatedN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantHearst CorporationN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantNational Public RadioN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantNew York Times CompanyN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantThe New YorkerN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantNewspaper Association of AmericaN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantRadio Television Digital News AssociationN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantReporters Committee for Freedom of the PressN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantSociety of Professional JournalistsN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
Amicus-AppellantTribune CompanyN
Bruce Gottlieb NN
AppellantWashington Post Newspaper (the)N
Laurie A. Babinski NN
Bruce D. BrownYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Patricia A. HeffernanYY
AppelleeIngmar Guandique Y
James W. KleinNY
Jonathan W. Anderson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/23/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (25-pgs/tape maar 11/24/10 proc.)w/cd
01/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/13/2011ORDERED: That James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Ingmar Guandique in this appeal. It is (more)
01/13/2011FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
01/26/2011RECORD INDEX
02/22/2011FiledAPPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/22/2011APPENDIX
03/01/2011FiledAMICUS CURIAE'S BRIEF
03/29/2011FiledAPPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/29/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/31/2011MEMORANDUM/STATEMENT IN LIEU OF BRIEF aple/Guandique
04/08/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
04/26/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
06/27/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
08/10/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Washington Post) (Appellant)
08/11/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte, that scheduled for consideration on the Regular Calendar of September 20, 2011, at 9:30am
08/11/2011FiledCalendar notice sent
09/20/2011FiledArgued Before Glickman,Oberly,King Bruce D.Brown Esq., for appellant Patrica A.Hefferman Esq.,for APPELLEE
01/19/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal is reversed and remanded for further proceedings consistent with this opinion.)
03/15/2012FiledMandate