judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00589-CR
05-94-00589-CR
04/13/1994
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Daniels, Sr., Bruce Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/13/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
05/13/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
05/10/1994Exhibits Filed
05/10/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/14/1994Transcript Filed
04/13/1994Notice Sent
04/13/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/23/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
01/06/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/13/1994Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
15th Judicial District Court
Grayson
Honorable James Ray Fry
039743
Life, TDC