judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4195
B-4195
08/29/1973
Application for Writ of Error
ARTHUR LANGLOTZ
CITIZENS FIDELITY INSURANCE CO.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/29/1974Reply to ResponseRespondent
01/23/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/27/1973Response to Brief filedPetitioner
12/26/1973Reply to ResponseRespondent
12/10/1973Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/29/1973Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/10/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
08/29/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/29/1974Reply to Response
01/28/1974Response to Motion filed
01/23/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/16/1974Opinion issued
12/27/1973Response to Brief filed
12/26/1973Reply to Response
12/10/1973Brief on the Merits
10/29/1973Brief on the Merits
10/17/1973Document received (See Remarks)
10/10/1973Response to Petition
08/29/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/29/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Citizens Fidelity Insurance Co.Respondent
Arthur LanglotzPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information