judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4197
B-4197
08/31/1973
Application for Writ of Error
SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE CO., WESTERN ELECTRIC CO., INC., RON MAPLES AND BOB GRAY, COMMUNICATION WORKERS OF AMEICA, AFL-CIO
INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF ELECTRICAL WORKERS, LOCAL UNION NO. 278
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/06/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/01/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/17/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
09/14/1973Amended PetitionPetitioner
08/31/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
08/31/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/13/1973Response to Motion filed
12/06/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/01/1973Reply to Response
09/17/1973Response to Petition
09/14/1973Amended Petition
09/13/1973Motion to amend application for writ of error
08/31/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/31/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/31/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Southwestern Bell Telephone Co., Western Electric Co., Inc., Ron Maples and Bob GrayPetitioner
International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local Union No. 278Respondent
Communication Workers of Ameica, AFL-CIOPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information