judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ESTEBAN LEGARDA-CORNELIO aka OTHONIEL LEGARDA CORNELIO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0083)
Case Number:S-09-0083Case Docketed On:04/24/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:ESTEBAN LEGARDA-CORNELIO aka OTHONIEL LEGARDA CORNELIO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ESTEBAN LEGARDA-CORNELIO aka OTHONIEL LEGARDA CORNELIO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEsteban Legarda-Cornelio Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin Ashkhan Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2009 WY 136
Citation:218 P.3d 968

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/24/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/18/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/04/2009Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant requesting file stamped copy of brief.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/04/2009Correspondence - Outgoing - sent letter to appellant with copy of brief.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
06/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
06/23/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval for Justin Daraie, to appear on behalf of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/26/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/01/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/14/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/15/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
11/06/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/13/2009Service - Mail returned - Copy of opinion mailed to appellant, "return to sender, no longer at this address".ServiceMail returnedFinal
11/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/24/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/24/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/30/2009Service - Mail returned - Copy of mandate mailed to appellant, "return to sender no longer at this address".ServiceMail returnedFinal
11/30/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 11/25/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
12/09/2009Correspondence - Incoming. Received letter from appellant inquiring about status of case. Noted new address and resent opinion this date.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal