judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYLER KERGER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1621
Short Caption:TYLER KERGER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Misd. Sex Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD10728-10Filed Date:12/29/2010

Opening Event Date:12/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/10/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:04/17/2012
Argued/Submitted:10/19/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/27/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyler Kerger YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Peter C. LallasYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/10/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
02/04/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
02/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (6 pgs/Tape - 12/15/10 proc.)
02/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (87 pgs/Tape - 12/16/10 proc.)
02/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (116 pgs/Tape - 12/20/10 proc.)
02/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (11 pgs/Tape - 12/21/10 proc.)(w/CD)
02/10/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/15/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/22/2011RECORD INDEX
02/22/2011FiledRecord Copies
03/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF NO OPPO 90 DAYS
04/11/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
07/12/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file brief
09/26/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - for 90 days (Appellant)Granted
10/07/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until Decmber 27, 2011
12/13/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - for 90 days (Appellant)Granted
12/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until March 16, 2012 or show cause why he should not be held in comtempt for failure to comply with this court's order
03/16/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
03/16/2012FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
04/17/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
04/17/2012FiledBriefing Completed
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/05/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)Granted
09/07/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for oral argument.
10/03/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/10/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
10/10/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
10/19/2012FiledArgued before Judges Washington, Glickman, Thompson
12/31/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, and Glickman and Thompson, Associate Jduges.)
01/09/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File to file any petition for rehearing or any petition for rehearing en banc Other (Appellant)Granted
01/16/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 3/18/13.
03/27/2013FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.
03/27/2013FiledMandate
04/05/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)