judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MRS. K. D. FENOGLIO GROUP, P. A. CARMINATI v. A. J. FENOGLIO, ET AL.

Case: A-4703
A-4703
05/24/1954
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. K. D. FENOGLIO GROUP, P. A. CARMINATI
A. J. FENOGLIO, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/13/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/12/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/03/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
06/03/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
06/01/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
05/24/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/13/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/12/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/03/1954Response to Petition
06/03/1954Response to Petition
06/01/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/24/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/24/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
A. J. Fenoglio, et al.Respondent
P. A. CarminatiPetitioner
Mrs. K. D. Fenoglio GroupPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information