judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4210
B-4210
09/06/1973
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
LIQUIDATION TRUSTEES OF REPUBLIC PETROLEUM CO., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/26/1974Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
03/26/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/27/1974Post submission brief filedPetitioner
02/11/1974Response to Brief filedRespondent
09/14/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
09/06/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/29/1974Response to Motion filed
03/26/1974Brief in Support of Petition
03/26/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/13/1974Opinion issued
02/27/1974Post submission brief filed
02/11/1974Response to Brief filed
02/08/1974Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filed
12/12/1973Document received (See Remarks)
12/12/1973Document received (See Remarks)
12/12/1973Document received (See Remarks)
09/14/1973Response to Petition
09/06/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/06/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Liquidation Trustees of Republic Petroleum Co., et al.Respondent
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information