judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4217
B-4217
09/10/1973
Application for Writ of Error
COLORADO COUNTY FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION, ET AL., SOUTH CENTRAL SAVINGS ASSOCIATION
W. SALE LEWIS, SAVINGS AND LOAN COMMISSIONER OF TEXAS, AUSTIN SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/04/1974Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/23/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/30/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/26/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
09/25/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
09/10/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
09/10/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/04/1974Reply to Response
05/30/1974Response to Motion filed
05/27/1974Response to Motion filed
05/23/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/30/1973Reply to Response
09/26/1973Response to Petition
09/25/1973Response to Petition
09/10/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/10/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/10/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Colorado County Federal Savings and Loan Association, et al.Petitioner
W. Sale Lewis, Savings and Loan Commissioner of TexasRespondent
Austin Savings and Loan AssociationRespondent
South Central Savings AssociationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information