judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4215
B-4215
09/10/1973
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. SEB S. WILCOX, ET AL.
ST. MARYS UNIVERSITY OF SAN ANTONIO, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/07/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/29/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/17/1973Reply to ResponseRespondent
10/11/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/27/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/25/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
09/10/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/13/1974Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
12/07/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/07/1973Response to Motion filed
11/29/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/14/1973Opinion issued
11/14/1973Document received (See Remarks)
11/14/1973Document received (See Remarks)
10/17/1973Reply to Response
10/11/1973Reply to Response
09/27/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/25/1973Response to Petition
09/10/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/10/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State of Texas and the City of LaredoAmicus Curiae
St. Marys University of San Antonio, Inc.Respondent
Mrs. Seb S. Wilcox, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information