judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4220
B-4220
09/10/1973
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
JOSEPH L. LEWIS
MARJORIE LEWIS HOBDY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/19/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
09/20/1973Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
09/10/1973Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
09/10/1973Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
09/10/1973Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/07/1973Opinion issued
10/19/1973Response to Petition
09/20/1973Exhibits in case/cause filed
09/14/1973Bond
09/10/1973Order from Lower Court filed
09/10/1973Brief in Support of Petition
09/10/1973Exhibits in case/cause filed
09/10/1973Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Marjorie Lewis HobdyRespondent
Joseph L. LewisRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information