judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6164
A-6164
01/04/1957
Application for Writ of Error
STANOLIND OIL AND GAS COMPANY, ET AL.
NEWMAN BROTHERS DRILLING COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/07/1957Response to Brief filedPetitioner
07/18/1957Reply to ResponseRespondent
07/12/1957Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/11/1957Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/10/1957Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/09/1957Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/03/1957Appendix FiledRespondent
07/03/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/29/1957Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/30/1957Response to Reply filedRespondent
01/23/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
01/14/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
01/04/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/22/1957Response to Motion filed
10/15/1957Motion for leave to file brief
08/07/1957Response to Brief filed
07/18/1957Reply to Response
07/12/1957Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/11/1957Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/10/1957Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/10/1957Response to Motion filed
07/09/1957Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/03/1957Additional Copies received
07/03/1957Appendix Filed
07/03/1957Additional Copies received
07/03/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/29/1957Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/19/1957Dissenting opinion issued.
06/19/1957Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
02/20/1957Document received (See Remarks)
01/30/1957Response to Reply filed
01/23/1957Reply to Response
01/14/1957Response to Petition
01/04/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/04/1957Document received (See Remarks)
01/04/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R. M. Wagstaff, John H. Alvis, J. H. HandAmicus Curiae
Worth B. DurhamAmicus Curiae
R. E. SchneiderAmicus Curiae
Stanolind Oil and Gas Company, et al.Petitioner
Halbert O. WoodwardAmicus Curiae
Glenn R. LewisAmicus Curiae
Newman Brothers Drilling Company, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information