judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LABOR COMMISSION VS. UNIVERSAL ELECTRIC

Case Information: 34902
Short Caption:LABOR COMMISSION VS. UNIVERSAL ELECTRICCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38073 , 41472
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A393053Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/08/1999 / Combs, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/29/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09341
09/30/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Appellant and respondent were transposed.
10/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/30/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-11933
12/16/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-12712
12/27/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-13153
12/27/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-13154
12/29/1999Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 99-13323
01/24/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal and for Sanctions. 00-01077
01/26/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal and for Sanctions. 00-01317
02/03/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Request to file Reply in Opposition to Labor Commission's Response to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-01716
03/03/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 3/1/00. 00-03444
03/03/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. 00-03445
03/22/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule. 00-04554
03/29/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Respondent has moved to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant opposes the motion. fn1[We deny as moot respondent's motion for leave to file a reply to the opposition.] Because we conclude the district court's interlocutory order of remand is not a final appealable judgment, we grant the motion to dismiss. fn3[We deny respondent's motion for attorney's fees as sanctions under NRAP 14.] We deny the request to treat this appeal as a writ petition, and the implied request to review the order under the collateral order doctrine. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-05070
03/31/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule. 00-05267
04/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. By order filed March 29, 2000, we dismissed the appeal. We deny the motion to suspend briefing as it is moot. 00-05579
04/25/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-06691
04/25/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 11, 2000. 00-06691