judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AARON M. ROSS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0082)
Case Number:S-09-0082Case Docketed On:04/23/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Other
Short Title:AARON M. ROSS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:AARON M. ROSS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAaron M. Ross Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2009 WY 101
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/23/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/30/2009Order - Convert to petition for Writ of ReviewOrderConvert to petitionFinal
06/08/2009Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
06/08/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/08/2009Motion - OtherMotionOtherFinal
06/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file pro se brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counsel; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/23/2009Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw, conditionally affirming judgment and sentenceOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
08/11/2009Brief - Failure to file - appellant (Anders)BriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
08/19/2009Opinion - Published order AffirmingOpinionPublished orderFinal
09/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/04/2009Record - Returned unfiled record to district court clerkRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
09/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/04/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/09/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 9/8/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal