judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6567
A-6567
11/07/1957
Application for Writ of Error
DAVID LEE FLOWERS
NANCE EXPLORATION COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/01/1958Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
05/01/1958Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/30/1958Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/25/1957Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/16/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
11/07/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/24/1958Letter Filed
05/15/1958Response to Motion filed
05/01/1958Supplemental Brief filed
05/01/1958Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/30/1958Additional Copies received
04/30/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/18/1958Letter Filed
11/25/1957Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/16/1957Response to Petition
11/11/1957Motion to Substitute filed
11/07/1957Additional Copies received
11/07/1957Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/07/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John J. WattsAmicus Curiae
David Lee FlowersPetitioner
Nance Exploration CompanyRespondent
Ira ButlerAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information