judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICKEY L. CAGLE v. JACK TROESTER and CRAZY CRAWFISH, LLC d/b/a TOMMY JACK'S

Case Heading (S-11-0036)
Case Number:S-11-0036Case Docketed On:02/07/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:MICKEY L. CAGLE v. JACK TROESTER and CRAZY CRAWFISH, LLC d/b/a TOMMY JACK'S
Full Title:MICKEY L. CAGLE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JACK TROESTER and CRAZY CRAWFISH, LLC d/b/a TOMMY JACK'S, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMickey L. CagleSean W. Scoggin
Brian John Hunter
AppelleeJack TroesterRichard J. Szekely
AppelleeCrazy Crawfish, LLC d/b/a Tommy Jack'sLaurence W. Stinson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/07/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/07/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/23/2011Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
02/28/2011Petition - Reinstatement; and attached affidavits.PetitionReinstatementFinal
02/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's combined W.R.A.P. 15 petition for reinstatement and brief of points and authorities.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/14/2011Event - Phone Call - received call from counsel for appellee Crazy Crawfish, d/b/a Tommy Jack's, indicating that he has no objection to reinstatement and will not file an opposition.EventPhone CallFinal
03/22/2011Order - Denying Petition to Reinstate AppealOrderDenyFinal
03/22/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal