judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6560
A-6560
10/22/1957
Application for Writ of Error
F. A. FINBERG, ET UX.
PRESTON STATE BANK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/04/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/06/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
10/28/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/10/1957Response to Motion filed
12/04/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/06/1957Response to Petition
10/28/1957Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/22/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
F. A. Finberg, et ux.Petitioner
Preston State BankRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information