judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KATHRYN BRINKMAN WEISS v. GARY ALLEN WEISS

Case Heading (S-09-0068)
Case Number:S-09-0068Case Docketed On:04/01/2009
Linked To: S-09-0030
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:KATHRYN BRINKMAN WEISS v. GARY ALLEN WEISS
Full Title:KATHRYN BRINKMAN WEISS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. GARY ALLEN WEISS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKathryn Brinkman WeissKenneth S. Cohen
Heather Noble
AppelleeGary Allen WeissLois Kimberly Weiss
Lea Jacobs Kuvinka
Other Particpants
Guardian ad litemJean A. Day

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Child Custody/Visitation
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/01/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/01/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/01/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/08/2009Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
04/10/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Consolidate Appeals and for Coordinated Briefing ScheduleEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/21/2009Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
04/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Kathryn Weiss response to Gary Weiss motion to consolidate appeals.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/28/2009Order - Consolidating cases and denying Motion for Coordinated Briefing ScheduleOrderConsolidating casesFinal
05/19/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
05/27/2009Event - Phone Call - Mr. Cohen not available for oral argument August 3-14th.EventPhone CallFinal
06/23/2009Order - Other - Order Removing Brief of Appellee and Requesting Corrected Brief.OrderOtherFinal
06/26/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/29/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's opening brief; and received copy of appellee's designation of the record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/06/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/03/2009Correspondence - Incoming from counsel for AppellantCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/04/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Lois Kimberly Weiss on behalf of Gary Allen Weiss.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/17/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes, each containing Original Papers, Exhibits & Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kenneth S. Cohen for Kathryn Weiss.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Lois Kimberly Weiss for appellant in S-09-0030; Kenneth S. Cohen for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/09/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirming in S-09-0030 and dismissing and remanding in S-09-0068, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/23/2009Petition - Rehearing with memorandum in support.PetitionRehearingFinal
10/23/2009Motion - Accept misc. documentsMotionAccept misc. documentsFinal
10/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant/Appellee's Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Motion for Order Permitting GAL to file Memorandum of Points and Authorities Supportive of Appellee's Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/02/2009Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from Mr. Cohen indicating that he does not intend to respond to petition for rehearing, requested issuance of mandate in S-09-0030.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/03/2009Motion - Other - Motion to strike improper ex parte communication by opposing counselMotionOtherFinal
11/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to strike improper ex parte communication by opposing counsel.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/06/2009Response/Objection - to petition for rehearing and motion to strike.Response/ObjectionExtensionFinal
11/09/2009Received form Order - Awarding attorney fees and costs (Form order only, submitted pursuant to W.R.A.P. 16 - not filed)OrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
11/10/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Kathryn Weiss Response to Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2009Order - Other - Order denying motion to strike; order denying motion to permit GAL to file memorandum in support of rehearing; and order granting, in part, petition for rehearing.OrderOtherFinal
11/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/10/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/10/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/18/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/16/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal