judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LATHAM VS. DAIRYLAND INSURANCE

Case Information: 34888
Short Caption:LATHAM VS. DAIRYLAND INSURANCECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A402089Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Office of Paul Vanderwerken--check no. 4007.
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09194
09/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/30/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: September 29, 1999. 99-09864
01/21/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-00991
02/09/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 00-02031
03/13/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation of Counsel for Dismissal of Appeal. 00-03925
03/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NNP/CLK 00-05123
03/30/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.