judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00300-CV
14-94-00300-CV
03/30/1994
Contract
Hickory Ridge Homeowners Association, Et Al
Sawtelle, Don W. and Sawtelle, Wife Marie
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/16/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/31/1996Case stored
05/17/1996Mandate due to be issued
05/17/1996Mandate Issued
05/17/1996Mandate Issued
05/02/1996Writ of Error DISPOSEDDENIED
12/18/1995Writ of error DUE
12/18/1995Writ of Error FILED
11/16/1995Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
09/15/1995Motion for rehearing DUE
09/14/1995Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
08/31/1995Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
08/31/1995Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/31/1995Opinion Withdrawn
08/31/1995Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
08/04/1995Motion for rehearing DUE
08/04/1995Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
07/20/1995Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
07/19/1995Memorandum of Authorities
07/19/1995Submitted
07/19/1995Submission
07/19/1995Submitted
01/06/1995Reply Brief Filed
05/27/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/27/1994Case ready to be set
05/27/1994Case ready to be set
05/02/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/31/1994Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
03/30/1994Exhibits FILED
03/30/1994Transcript FILED
03/30/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/22/1994Exhibits received
02/28/1994Bond FILED
12/30/1993Motion for new trial FILED
12/02/1993Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/17/1996Case StoredCase stored
12/16/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantS. Bradley Todes
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantCharles E. Fitch
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeRussell D. Weaver
Trial Court Information
269th District Court
Harris
91-49852