judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-94-00051-CV
10-94-00051-CV
03/30/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Hubert Michael Thomas
Diana Jane Thomas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/26/2002Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/17/2001Six yrs. passed final disposition. Record will be destroyed w/in 90 dys unless req. by trial court clerk.
11/20/1995Case stored
11/20/1995Mandate issued by this Court
11/01/1995Case returned from higher court
09/28/1995(NO ACK) Writ disposed.Motion or Writ Denied
06/07/1995Case forwarded to higher court
05/30/1995No Description Available.
04/28/1995Response to motion
04/26/1995Motion for Rehearing filedMotion or Writ Denied
04/26/1995Sent to publisherDismissed as moot
04/17/1995Motion for Rehearing filed
04/13/1995Sent to publisher
03/29/1995Cause reinstated after remanded from higher court.
03/29/1995Motion for Rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/29/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/29/1995Cause reinstated after remanded from higher court.
03/03/1995Response to motion
02/15/1995Motion for Rehearing filed
01/30/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/10/1994Post-Submission Letter Brief filed
11/03/1994Post-Submission Letter Brief filed
11/02/1994Submitted
11/02/1994Submission
09/19/1994Submission
08/24/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/18/1994Case ready to be set
08/18/1994No Description Available.
08/18/1994Brief received, not filed
08/17/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/16/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
08/01/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
07/05/1994No Description Available.
07/05/1994No Description Available.
06/08/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/08/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/27/1994No Description Available.
05/27/1994No Description Available.
05/27/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
05/27/1994No Description Available.
05/27/1994No Description Available.
05/03/1994No Description Available.
05/02/1994No Description Available.
04/06/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/06/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/30/1994No Description Available.
03/30/1994No Description Available.
03/30/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/26/2002Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Thomas, Diana JaneAppelleeLaNelle L. McNamara
Thomas, Hubert MichaelAppellantAmy Thomas Ward
Trial Court Information
77th District Court
Limestone
Honorable R. W. Lawrence
22,100-A