judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-94-00084-CV
12-94-00084-CV
03/30/1994
Miscellaneous civil
K., J. A., In the Matter of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/28/2012Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/17/1995
02/17/1995Case stored
02/13/1995Mandate Issued
01/27/1995
01/12/1995
12/28/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
12/28/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/10/1994Submitted
11/10/1994Submission
10/20/1994
10/20/1994Submission
10/20/1994
10/10/1994Brief Filed
10/10/1994Case ready to be set
09/13/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
09/13/1994Order Entered
09/07/1994
08/30/1994supplemental transcript filed
08/25/1994Brief Filed
08/25/1994Brief Received
08/05/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
08/05/1994Order Entered
07/21/1994Letter from the Court
06/27/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/27/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
06/08/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/09/1994
03/30/1994No Description Available.
03/30/1994No Description Available.
03/30/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/28/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/17/1994
01/28/1994Order Entered
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/28/2012Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasMr. David Kennedy
K., J. A.AppellantMr. James R. Kittles
Trial Court Information
173rd District Court
Henderson
Honorable Alvin G Khoury
J-732