judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00309-CR
01-94-00309-CR
03/29/1994
Assault & battery
Mauro, Steven Lelio
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/1995Mandate issued
12/14/1994Motion for rehearing was not filed
11/03/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
11/03/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
07/26/1994Brief due for retained counsel
05/26/1994Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
05/17/1994Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
05/11/1994Transcript filed
03/29/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/21/1994Notice of appeal filed
01/11/1994Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/09/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantStanley G. Schneider
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 4
Harris
Honorable JAMES ANDERSON
9352025
1 yr hcj