judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NORTH AMERICAN ENTERPRISES VS. GRECIAN IMPORTS

Case Information: 34887
Short Caption:NORTH AMERICAN ENTERPRISES VS. GRECIAN IMPORTSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A388527Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/28/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Michael H. Singer, Ltd.--check no. 14266.
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09189
09/30/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/05/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 1, 1999. 99-10920
12/06/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 20, 1999. 99-12161
12/21/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 13, 2000. 99-12991
01/18/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 25, 2000. 00-00771
02/03/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 7, 2000. 00-01752
03/17/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 12, 2000. 00-04270
06/13/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 16, 2000. 00-10011
08/21/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-14647
08/21/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
09/05/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-15598
09/07/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-15773
01/16/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Corrected brief due: 10 days.
01/16/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 10 days.
01/29/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to File Brief and Appendix Late and for Extension of Time. 01-01860
01/31/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before February 9, 2001. 01-02029
03/01/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (and appendix). 01-03794
03/01/2001BriefReceived Opening Brief. Mailed on: 2/28/01. 01-03795
03/06/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on March 1, 2001. 01-04084
03/06/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. 01-03795
03/06/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 01-03797
04/04/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 2, 2001. 01-05757
04/18/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellants have failed to file either a transcript request form or certificate that no transcripts are requested. Appellants shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required document. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against appellants' counsel. 01-06614
04/26/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-07048
05/04/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Unopposed Motion for Extension of time to file Respondents' Answering Brief. Two day request. 01-07503
05/09/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed May 4, 2001. The clerk shall file the answering brief and athe appendix to the answering brief received on May 8, 2001. 01-07792
05/09/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. 01-07714
05/09/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-07715
06/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 01-10994
06/28/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML. 01-20961
01/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00255
01/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/25/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2002. 02-00255