judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GERALD D. HUTCHINSON, TRUSTEE OF THE VERA J. HUTCHINSON REVOCABLE TRUST DATED OCTOBER 28, 1999 v. CARA J. TAFT, TRUSTEE OF THE TAFT LIVING TRUST DATED AUSUT 19 1983, and BARBARA JO HARNEY COCKRELL and ROBERTA ANNE HARNEY CAUSEY, co-Executrices of the ESTATE OF LEON THOMSON HARNEY

Case Heading (S-09-0067)
Parent: S-09-0028 Case Docketed On:04/01/2009
Consolidated:S-09-0067
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:GERALD D. HUTCHINSON, TRUSTEE OF THE VERA J. HUTCHINSON REVOCABLE TRUST DATED OCTOBER 28, 1999 v. CARA J. TAFT, TRUSTEE OF THE TAFT LIVING TRUST DATED AUSUT 19 1983, and BARBARA JO HARNEY COCKRELL and ROBERTA ANNE HARNEY CAUSEY, co-Executrices of the ESTATE OF LEON THOMSON HARNEY
Full Title:GERALD D. HUTCHINSON, TRUSTEE OF THE VERA J. HUTCHINSON REVOCABLE TRUST DATED OCTOBER 28, 1999, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CARA J. TAFT, TRUSTEE OF THE TAFT LIVING TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 1983, and BARBARA JO HARNEY COCKRELL and ROBERTA ANNE HARNEY CAUSEY, co-Executrices of the ESTATE OF LEON THOMSON HARNEY, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGerald D. HutchinsonMatthew H. Romsa
John Matthew Kuker
James Michael Peterson
AppelleeCara J. TaftJames R. Salisbury
AppelleeBarbara Jo Harney CockrellJames R. Salisbury
AppelleeRoberta Anne Harney CauseyJames R. Salisbury

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property - Real - Adverse Possession, Trial - Post-trial Motions
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/01/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/01/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/01/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
05/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's statement of costs; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/19/2009Brief - Appellant (The system generated file date stamp is 5/20/09, but brief was timely filed 5/19/09). The system rejected the brief twice before the 5:00 p.m. deadline and counsel was in contact with the Clerk's office trying to rectify the problem prior to that deadline.BriefAppellantFinal
05/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/06/2009Brief - Appellees (Filed this date, system didn't put electronic file stamp on document)BriefAppelleeFinal
07/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costs (Also filed this date, system didn't put electronic file stamp on document)Notice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
07/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellees; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' statement of costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/04/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Matthew H. Romsa for appellant Hutchinson.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James Salisbury for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/11/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/11/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court (supplemental - oversized exhibit)Notice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/24/2009Record - Supplemental record on appeal, one volume, oversized exhibit, labeled as volume VI.RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
08/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Supplemental record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingSupplemental record on appeal filedFinal
09/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Matthew H. Romsa for appellant; James R. Salisbury for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/14/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/01/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/01/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/03/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/2/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal