judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0302
94-0302
03/30/1994
Mandamus/Cause
OMEGA OB/GYN ASSOCIATES and OMEGA OB/GYN ASSOCIATES OF SOUTH ARLINGTON P.A.
THE FIRST COURT OF APPEALS and THE HONORABLE EUGENE CHAMBERS JUDGE OF THE 215TH DISTRICT COURT HARRIS COUNTY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/28/1994Motion for RehearingRelator's Motion for Rehearing of Cause filedRULE 4(B), ENV ATTACHED TO ORIGINAL
11/10/1994Exhibits in case/cause filedFILED DUE TO GRANT
05/10/1994Reply BriefRespondent"Objections of Beverly Bearden Gustafson and Robert D. Gustafson, et al. to motion for leave..."
04/06/1994Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/03/1995Letter Filedre: settlement
03/30/1995Letter Receivedfrom Rod Patterson requesting In-Camera exhibits
03/30/1995Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarksfrom John T. Adams
03/10/1995Case Stored890 SW2d 809
03/10/1995Cost letter issued
02/16/1995Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
11/28/1994Motion for RehearingRULE 4(B), ENV ATTACHED TO ORIGINAL
11/28/1994Motion for Rehearing forwardedrecord remains in clerk's office
11/10/1994M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedWrit of Mandamus or Prohibition granted per R.122.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
11/10/1994M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
11/10/1994Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordPETITION F/WRIT OF MANDAMUS CONDITIONALLY GRANTED W/O REF TO MERITS & W/O PREJUDICE TO REFILE
11/10/1994Exhibits in case/cause filedFILED DUE TO GRANT
11/10/1994M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedWrit of Mandamus or Prohibition granted per R.122.WITH PER CURIAM OPINION ISSUED
11/10/1994Opinion issuedWrit of Mandamus conditionally grantedPER CURIAM OPINION 890 SW2d 809
11/10/1994Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedFILED DUE TO GRANT
05/10/1994Reply Brief"Objections of Beverly Bearden Gustafson and Robert D. Gustafson, et al. to motion for leave..."
04/06/1994Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus
03/30/1994Motion for temporary relief
03/30/1994Motion for temporary relief disposedFiling grantedOrder signed 03-08-94, by Hon. Chambers regarding production of priviledged docs & info. is stayed. Opin & Judg signed 03-04-94 by 1st COA.
03/30/1994Exhibits receivedOriginal & 2 copies of Exhibits 1-17
03/30/1994Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
03/30/1994Petition for writ received
03/30/1994Request made for reply to proceedingby April 6, 1994
03/30/1994Stay Order issued
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
03/10/1995Case StoredCase stored.Mo/Re Overruled
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
OMEGA OB/GYN ASSOC. OF SOUTHRelatorMr. Jordan M. Parker
Ms. Evelyn R. Leopold
Mr. Kenneth Charles Cunningham
HCA SOUTH ARLINGTON MEDICALOther interested party Mr. Don Harvey
Mr. Keith S. Dubanevich
N/F OF MICHAEL JAMES GUSTAFSONRespondentMr. Norman Riedmueller
J.P., M.D.RelatorMs. Margaret Uhlig Pemberton
The Honorable Jan Soifer
O'CONNOR, MICHOLJudgeHonorable Michol O'Connor
JACK ECKERD CORPORATIONOther interested party Ms. Kathleen A. Gallagher
GUSTAFSON, BEVERLY BEARDENRespondentMr. Michael A. Pullara
DAVID, LORIOther interested party Ms. Kathleen A. Gallagher
GUSTAFSON, ROBERT D.RespondentMr. Michael A. Pullara
OMEGA OB/GYN ASSOCIATESRelatorMr. Rod Patterson
Court of Appeals Information:
01-93-00988-CV
Denied/Condition Granted
___ SW2d ___, 03-04-94
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable MICHOL O'CONNOR
Trial Court Information
215th District Court
Harris
Honorable Eugene Chambers
92-006155