judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4737
A-4737
06/10/1954
Application for Writ of Error
SANTOS GONZALEZ
UNITED STATES FIDELITY AND GUARANTY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/14/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
06/10/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/02/1955Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
01/19/1955Opinion issued
07/21/1954Document received (See Remarks)
06/14/1954Response to Petition
06/10/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/10/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Santos GonzalezPetitioner
United States Fidelity and Guaranty CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information