judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4192
B-4192
08/23/1973
Application for Writ of Error
LAKE TRANSPORT, INC.
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS AND COASTAL TRANSPORT CO., INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/06/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/07/1974Response to Brief filedPetitioner
12/31/1973Post submission brief filedRespondent
12/04/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/04/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/07/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
08/27/1973Errata FiledPetitioner
08/23/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/04/1974Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
06/03/1974Motion to Certify filedFiling granted
03/13/1974Response to Motion filed
03/06/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/20/1974Letter Filed
01/07/1974Response to Brief filed
12/31/1973Post submission brief filed
12/13/1973Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filedFiling granted
12/04/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/04/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/31/1973Document received (See Remarks)
10/31/1973Document received (See Remarks)
09/07/1973Response to Petition
08/28/1973Document received (See Remarks)
08/27/1973Errata Filed
08/23/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Railroad Commission of Texas and Coastal Transport Co., Inc.Respondent
V. C. Bilbo, Jr., dba Biblo Freight Lines and Biblo Transports, Inc.Amicus Curiae
Lake Transport, Inc.Petitioner
UNITED STATES GYPSUM COMPANYAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information