judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THE MATTER OF THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A PRIVATE ROAD: STEPHEN SMITH and AUDREY SMITH, Husband and Wife v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PARK COUNTY, Wyoming and SCOTT and MARJORIE JUSTICE

Case Heading (S-09-0084)
Case Number:S-09-0084Case Docketed On:04/27/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Highways (Title 24)
Short Title:THE MATTER OF THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A PRIVATE ROAD: STEPHEN SMITH and AUDREY SMITH, Husband and Wife v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PARK COUNTY, Wyoming and SCOTT and MARJORIE JUSTICE
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A PRIVATE ROAD: STEPHEN SMITH and AUDREY SMITH, Husband and Wife, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF PARK COUNTY, Wyoming, Appellee (Defendant), and SCOTT and MARJORIE JUSTICE, Appellees (Petitioners).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantStephen SmithStephen Joseph Darrah
AppellantAudrey SmithStephen Joseph Darrah
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Park County, WyomingJames F. Davis
AppelleeScott JusticeKendal Royce Hoopes
AppelleeMarjorie JusticeKendal Royce Hoopes
Other Particpants
Interested ObserverThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Bridget L. Hill

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/27/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/27/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/30/2009Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
05/13/2009Petition - ReinstatementPetitionReinstatementFinal
05/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for ReinstatementEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/19/2009Response/Objection - Motion for reinstatement.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/20/2009Response/Objection - Petition for reinstatementResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
05/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees Scott and Marjorie Justices' Objection to Petition for ReinstatementEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee Board of County Commissioners for Park County's Response to Appelants' Petition for ReinstatementEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/02/2009Order - Denying Petition for ReinstatementOrderDenyFinal
06/02/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal