judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4164
B-4164
08/13/1973
Application for Writ of Error
DR. N. JAY ROGERS
DR. JACK BURTON, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/08/1974Notice of Appeal filed
11/08/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/20/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
08/13/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/08/1974Notice of Appeal filed
12/11/1973Motion to Certify filed
11/09/1973Response to Motion filed
11/08/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/20/1973Response to Petition
08/13/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/13/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dr. N. Jay RogersPetitioner
Dr. Jack Burton, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information