judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00624-CR
05-94-00624-CR
04/15/1994
Sexual Abuse, Rape or Injury of a Child
Henry, Culberson Dewayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/28/1996Case stored
02/28/1996Mandate Issued
02/28/1996Mandate Issued
02/22/1996Mandate due to be issued
02/07/1996Case Returned from Higher Ct.
01/10/1996MattConv
10/23/1995Record Shipped
10/12/1995Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/12/1995Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCA
10/04/1995Petition for discretionary review due
10/04/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
09/25/1995Petition for discretionary review due
08/23/1995Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/23/1995Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCA
07/25/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/25/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/11/1995Supplemental Brief Filed
04/19/1995Submission
04/19/1995Submitted
04/19/1995Submission
04/19/1995Submitted
03/14/1995MattConv
01/31/1995Brief Filed
01/31/1995Case ready to be set
01/31/1995MattConv
01/31/1995Case ready to be set
01/03/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/22/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/31/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/20/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/29/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/20/1994Brief Filed
09/20/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/12/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/08/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/18/1994Statement of Facts Filed
05/17/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/29/1994Transcript Filed
04/15/1994Notice Sent
04/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/10/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
03/10/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/28/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Henry, Culberson DewayneCriminal - AppellantJeffrey B. Keck
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasAnne Wetherholt
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable F. H. Entz
F93-43597-NM
40 yrs TDC