judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-94-00090-CR
08-94-00090-CR
04/15/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Perez, Luis Robert
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/07/1995Mandate Issued
04/07/1995Shuck purged
04/07/1995Mandate Issued
12/23/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/23/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/03/1994Submitted
11/03/1994Submission
11/03/1994Submitted
10/06/1994Submission
09/14/1994Brief Filed
09/14/1994Case ready to be set
09/14/1994Case ready to be set
08/10/1994Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/28/1994Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
07/19/1994Brief Filed
06/15/1994Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/02/1994Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/05/1994Statement of Facts Filed
05/05/1994Transcript Filed
04/15/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/07/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PEREZ, LUIS ROBERTCriminal - AppellantHon. Mike V. Gonsalez
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasHon. J. W. Johnson
Trial Court Information
112th District Court
Crockett
Honorable M. Brock Jones
1730
5 Yrs. TDC