judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-94-00063-CV
10-94-00063-CV
04/15/1994
Prohibition
Donna Douthitt Jones, et al., Relators
Honorable W.T. McDonald, Jr., et al., Respondents
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/26/2002Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/17/1996Case is ready to be stripped
07/13/1994Case stored
07/13/1994Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
06/01/1994Motion for extension of time to file responseMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/1994Submitted
05/18/1994Exhibits Filed
05/18/1994Motion for extension of time to file response
05/18/1994Submission
05/12/1994Response to motion
04/19/1994Motion for Leave to File.Motion or Writ Granted
04/19/1994Petition for Writ of Prohibition
04/19/1994Submission
04/15/1994Motion for Leave to File.
04/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/26/2002Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jones, Donna DouthittRelatorMichael J. Simmang
Max E. Roesch
Cagle, Cactus JackRespondentCactus Jack Cagle
Fuller, CleathernRespondentCleathern Fuller
Douthitt, CameronRelatorMichael J. Simmang
Max E. Roesch
Mcdonald, Jr., W. T.RespondentJudge W. T. McDonald Jr.
Trial Court Information