judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00388-CV
14-94-00388-CV
04/15/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Marc Hambaugh, Ind. D/B/A 'A' Quality Pool Service
Truck Insurance Exchange
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/31/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/28/1994Mandate Issued
06/28/1994Mandate Issued
05/27/1994No motion for rehearing FILED
05/12/1994Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAOVERRULED
05/12/1994Opinion issuedDISMISSED
05/12/1994Opinion issuedDISMISSED
05/11/1994Submitted
05/11/1994Submission
05/11/1994Submitted
04/28/1994Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
04/15/1994Transcript FILED
04/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/11/1994Bond FILED
04/11/1994Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/28/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantDavid Falk
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeJohn Totz
Trial Court Information
Honorable DAVID M. PATRONELLA
321,851