judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ELVIS W. PARKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1618
Short Caption:ELVIS W. PARKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-10125-10Filed Date:12/27/2010

Opening Event Date:12/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/29/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/03/2012
Argued/Submitted:12/13/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/03/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantElvis W. Parker Y
James W. KleinNY
Sloan S.J. JohnstonNY
Premal DhariaNN
Daniel GonenYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
L. Jackson Thomas, IIYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/07/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
02/04/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (109 pgs/Ott) 9/20/10 proc.
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (169 pgs/Hunt) 9/21/10 proc.
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (208 pgs/Hunt) 9/22/10 proc.
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (93 pgs/Hunt) 9/23/10 proc.
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (17 pgs/Hunt) 9/24/10 proc.
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (108 pgs/Ramos) 9/27/10 proc.
03/29/2011error
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (109-126 pgs/Ramos) 9/28/10 proc.
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (127-147 pgs/Ramos) 9/29/10 proc.
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (14 pgs/tape) 11/30/10 proc. w/cd
03/29/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/04/2011RECORD INDEX
04/04/2011RECORD COPIES
04/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
05/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 15, 2011. (Castillo)
08/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (90 Days) (Appellant)
08/25/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 11/14/11.
11/04/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file brief and the limited appendix on 2/13/12.
02/07/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/21/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 5/5/12.
05/04/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
05/04/2012FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
06/04/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
06/22/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 7/5/12.
07/05/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Denied Without Prejudice
07/12/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 8/7/12
08/03/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/03/2012FiledBriefing Completed
08/15/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
11/01/2012LodgedACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/13/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)Granted
11/13/2012FiledNotice Received - Attorney Daniel Gonen will replace Attorney Premal Dharia as counsel for oral argument. (Appellant)
11/19/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for oral argument.
11/19/2012FiledCalendar notice sent
11/21/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/07/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
12/07/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
12/13/2012FiledArgued before Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Oberly, Ferren (Daniel Gonen, Esq. for appellant L. Jackson Thomas, II, Esq. for appellee)
03/08/2013FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
06/11/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge)
07/03/2013FiledMandate
08/09/2013FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Denied
08/12/2013FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE and EXTEND TIME TO FILE PFRH
08/26/2013FiledORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE and for extension of time to file a petition for rehearing...
11/07/2013FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate and for leave to file petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)Denied
11/07/2013LodgedPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
11/13/2013FiledTMC/MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE and TO FILE lodged PERH
11/20/2013FiledORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE