judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JENNINGS (ROBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34898
Short Caption:JENNINGS (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR972322Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/07/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/09/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/09/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. Document No. 99-08491.
09/16/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Certified copy of district court order appointing John Calvert as counsel for appellant. Document No. 99-08767.
09/28/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/28/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09271
09/30/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Jeremy Bosler shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. fn1[On September 16, 1999, this court received a copy of an order from the district court appointing John Calvert to represent appellant in this appeal. The district court's order does not, however, relieve Jeremy Bosler of his obligations pursuant to NRAP 3C]. Document No. 99-09413.
10/08/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Motion, Pursuant to NRAP 2, for Suspension of filing deadlines pending this court's ruling on the motion. Document No. 99-09765.
10/13/1999Letter/IncomingReceived Proper Person Letter. Proper person letter from appellant Robert H. Jennings. Document No. 99-09935.
10/27/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court is directed to close administratively Docket No. 34797. The clerk shall transfer to Docket No. 34898 all documents filed or received in Docket No. 37497. This appeal shall proceed under Docket No. 34898. Nos. 34797, 34898. 99-10505
11/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of the district court shall have 10 days from the date of this order to transmit a copy of the September 21, 1999 order appointing counsel to the clerk of this court. Calvert shall have 10 days to enter an appearance with the clerk of this court; 15 days to file a docketing statement and eithter a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request; and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn1[We have received and considered appellant's proper person letter submitted on October 13, 1999. Appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal and shall direct all concerns relating to this appeal to his counsel]. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-11554
11/29/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: John P. Calvert hereby gives notice that he has been appointed by District Court order to represent appellant in this appeal. 99-11876
12/01/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on September 21, 1999, appointing John Calvert as counsel for appellant. 99-12018
12/02/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-12048
12/02/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 10, 1999, July 13, 1999, August 25, 1999. To Court Reporter: I. Zihn. 99-12049
12/03/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 10, 1999, July 13, 1999, August 25, 1999. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 99-12102
03/17/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 3/16/00. 00-04247
03/17/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-04249
05/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the answering brief or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for respondent. Appellant may, within 30 days of service of the answering brief, file and serve a reply brief. 00-07701
05/17/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-08238
05/17/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 5/15/00. 00-08241
07/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-11545
07/07/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/24/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. we "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-14368
09/18/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-14397
09/18/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 20, 2001. 01-14397