judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID GENTILINI v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0078)
Case Number:S-09-0078Case Docketed On:04/16/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DAVID GENTILINI v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DAVID GENTILINI, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid GentiliniDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 74
Citation:231 P.3d 1280

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/16/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/03/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/08/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/03/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/04/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/03/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/21/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/21/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/28/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal