judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00390-CR
14-94-00390-CR
04/15/1994
Other Drug Possession
Aleman, Hilario
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/08/1996Case stored
03/04/1996Mandate due to be issued
03/04/1996Mandate Issued
03/04/1996Mandate Issued
02/27/1996No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
02/19/1996Petition for discretionary review due
02/02/1996Motion for rehearing DUE
02/02/1996No motion for rehearing FILED
01/18/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/18/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
12/14/1995Submitted
12/14/1995Submission
12/14/1995Submitted
08/08/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/08/1994Case ready to be set
08/08/1994Case ready to be set
07/19/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/30/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/23/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/24/1994Record Filed (Both records FILED)
05/16/1994Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
04/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/14/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
03/25/1994Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/25/2017Case StoredCase archived
03/04/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantJoseph M. Rumbaut
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
677946
6 yrs. prob. & $100 fine