judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00621-CR
05-94-00621-CR
04/15/1994
Other Felony
Eubanks, Jason J.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/29/1994Mandate Issued
07/29/1994Mandate Issued
07/29/1994Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
07/29/1994Transcript Filed
07/29/1994Mandate Issued
07/29/1994Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
07/28/1994Motion to Expedite Mandate
07/28/1994Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
07/20/1994MattConv
07/18/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/15/1994MattConv
07/06/1994MattConv
07/05/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/15/1994Notice Sent
04/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/15/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/22/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/29/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Mark S Tolle
F93-01841-J
10 yrs TDC