judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00632-CR
05-94-00632-CR
04/15/1994
Robbery
Hill, Uzell
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/30/1996Case stored
09/30/1996Mandate Issued
09/30/1996Mandate Issued
09/21/1996Mandate due to be issued
07/23/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/23/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/15/1996Submission
05/15/1996Submitted
05/15/1996Submission
05/15/1996Submitted
04/18/1996MattConv
11/30/1995MattConv
11/17/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/16/1995Brief Filed
11/16/1995Case ready to be set
11/16/1995Case ready to be set
11/10/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/06/1995MattConv
08/25/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/18/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/08/1995MattConv
07/14/1995Brief Filed
06/10/1995MattConv
05/31/1995Letter Sent by the Court
01/15/1995MattConv
11/14/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/07/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/03/1994MattConv
09/30/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/13/1994MattConv
09/13/1994Statement of Facts Filed
08/03/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/27/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/06/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
06/30/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/10/1994Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/06/1994Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
05/19/1994Transcript Tendered
05/19/1994Transcript Filed
04/15/1994Notice Sent
04/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/17/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
02/17/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/30/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasAnne Wetherholt
Hill, UzellCriminal - AppellantKatherine A. Drew
Trial Court Information
363rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Faith Simmons
F94-00187-HW
75 yrs TDC